U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00201
  • Case Name: Folsom v. Pottawatomie County Courts et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [USCA - Mandate Issued]
  • August 02, 2022: [USCA Order]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [USCA Order]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order]
  • June 07, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • June 07, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 07, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 12, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • May 09, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order]
  • April 08, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • April 05, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 05, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • April 04, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 04, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • March 11, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • March 11, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • March 11, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.