U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00203
  • Case Name: Peya et al v. RV World LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Docket]
  • April 18, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • April 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 06, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 14, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 14, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.