U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00205
  • Case Name: Morrison v. Austin et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 21, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 02, 2022: [Docket]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 12, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Dismiss]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 21, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • May 05, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 05, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 15, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • March 14, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 14, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.