U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00210
  • Case Name: Osorio v. The Geo. Group Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 27, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • April 26, 2022: [Receipt]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 01, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Order]
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 15, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • March 15, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 15, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 15, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.