U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00207
  • Case Name: Britecore Holdings Inc v. American Farmers and Ranchers Mutual Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 20, 2023: [Substitute Party]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 20, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 20, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 06, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 05, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • September 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 13, 2022: [Docket]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • August 25, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 17, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 04, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 04, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 03, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • July 14, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • July 14, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • July 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 14, 2022: [Consolidate Cases]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • March 16, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 15, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.