U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00208
  • Case Name: US Bank National Association v. Morris et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 10, 2023: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 20, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 19, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • July 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • June 02, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Docket]
  • May 11, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • May 11, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • May 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • April 06, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 15, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 15, 2022: [Complaint]
  • March 15, 2022: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.