U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00218
  • Case Name: Taylor v. Crow
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • June 29, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Receipt]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • March 28, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 17, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • March 17, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 17, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.