U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00215
  • Case Name: R Thompson Development Company v. American National Property and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • October 10, 2022: [ADR Report by Mediator / Evaluator]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • July 01, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • July 01, 2022: [Protective Order]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 25, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • June 24, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Docket]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • April 15, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • April 15, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • April 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 17, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 17, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.