U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00217
  • Case Name: American Farmers and Ranchers Mutual Insurance Company v. Intuitive Web Solutions LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 05, 2022: [Transcript]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Enforce]
  • May 16, 2022: [Other Hearing]
  • May 16, 2022: [Objections]
  • May 13, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • May 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 13, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • May 11, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order]
  • May 09, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 06, 2022: [Enforce]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 25, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order]
  • April 21, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order]
  • April 19, 2022: [ADR Report by Mediator / Evaluator]
  • April 01, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order]
  • March 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 24, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 24, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 24, 2022: [Strike]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order]
  • March 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 18, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 17, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 17, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice of Related or Companion Case]
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice of Pending Motions]
  • March 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.