U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00219
  • Case Name: Padron v. Glancy et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 06, 2023: [Amended Complaint]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • December 01, 2022: [Leave]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 06, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • July 05, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • July 05, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • July 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • June 16, 2022: [Docket]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • May 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Receipt]
  • March 17, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.