U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00220
  • Case Name: Self v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • January 03, 2023: [Attorney Fees]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 22, 2022: [Brief]
  • December 22, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • September 22, 2022: [Remand to Agency]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • June 10, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • June 10, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order]
  • June 09, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • June 09, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 24, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 17, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 17, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.