U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00223
  • Case Name: Arkon Solutions Inc v. Platinum Chemical Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order Reassigning Case]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Bill of Costs Hearing set]
  • December 28, 2022: [Costs]
  • December 28, 2022: [Bill of Costs]
  • December 28, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • December 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • November 14, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 27, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • May 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 11, 2022: [Docket]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • April 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 29, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 23, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 22, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 18, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.