U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00224
  • Case Name: Gentry v. Housing Authority for the City of Del City, Oklahoma et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Witness List]
  • January 24, 2023: [Exhibit List]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Notice (other)]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • September 09, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • September 06, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • September 06, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Stipulation]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 19, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • May 19, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • May 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Docket]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 23, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • March 18, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • March 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 18, 2022: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • March 18, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 18, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.