U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00227
  • Case Name: Eckard Land & Acquisition LLC v. Conley
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 08, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order]
  • November 01, 2022: [Docket]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 04, 2022: [Objections]
  • October 03, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • September 20, 2022: [Witness List]
  • September 20, 2022: [Objections]
  • September 06, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 22, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • May 09, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • May 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 03, 2022: [Docket]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order]
  • April 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • April 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 05, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Receipt]
  • March 18, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 18, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.