U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00221
  • Case Name: Young v. Oklahoma State of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order]
  • May 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • April 19, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order]
  • March 18, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 18, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • March 18, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.