U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00226
  • Case Name: Mills v. Tinsley et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Report and Recommendation]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Exhibit]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • October 07, 2024: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 07, 2024: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • October 31, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Receipt]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 21, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • March 21, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 21, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.