U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00228
  • Case Name: State Farm Life Insurance Company v. Honomichl et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Notice (other)]
  • January 13, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 13, 2023: [Extension of Time]
  • January 06, 2023: [Exhibit List]
  • January 05, 2023: [Exhibit List]
  • January 03, 2023: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Witness List]
  • December 20, 2022: [Witness List]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 25, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • July 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 06, 2022: [Docket]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Discharge]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Discharge]
  • May 26, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • May 26, 2022: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • May 02, 2022: [Receipt]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Deposit Funds]
  • April 21, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 20, 2022: [Deposit Funds]
  • April 20, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 20, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 15, 2022: [Certificate of Service - NON SUMMONS]
  • April 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 14, 2022: [Crossclaim]
  • April 14, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • April 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 13, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order]
  • April 12, 2022: [Extension of Time]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 21, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 21, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 21, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.