U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00234
  • Case Name: Hutchison v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • October 20, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
  • October 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • October 13, 2022: [Leave]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 24, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • June 22, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • June 21, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • June 03, 2022: [Summons Issued]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 21, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 21, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.