U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00237
  • Case Name: Roe v. University of Central Oklahoma
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [Protective Order]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 02, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Docket]
  • May 06, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • March 23, 2022: [Leave]
  • March 22, 2022: [Leave]
  • March 22, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 22, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 22, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.