U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00236
  • Case Name: Shirley v. Crow
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order]
  • June 03, 2022: [Clarify]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • April 21, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • April 06, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 06, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • April 01, 2022: [Receipt]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Order]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 22, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • March 22, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.