U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00231
  • Case Name: Adair v. Elhabti
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • October 03, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • August 10, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order for Response]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 18, 2022: [Receipt]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order]
  • April 18, 2022: [~Util - Case Reopened]
  • April 18, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 25, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 22, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • March 22, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • March 22, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.