U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00204
  • Case Name: Dotson v. Millennium Financial Group LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • May 09, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • May 09, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • May 09, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 22, 2022: [Intervene]
  • April 11, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • April 11, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • April 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 05, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • April 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 22, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.