U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00235
  • Case Name: Aguilar-Chaidez v. The Geo Group Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • May 19, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 29, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • April 26, 2022: [Receipt]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 05, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 05, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 22, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • March 22, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 22, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 22, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.