U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00239
  • Case Name: Brewington v. Allied Waste Systems Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [~Notice (other)]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • January 12, 2023: [Withdraw]
  • January 09, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • January 04, 2023: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [Protective Order]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order]
  • June 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 01, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 25, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • May 06, 2022: [Docket]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order]
  • May 05, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • May 05, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • May 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 23, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 23, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.