U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00245
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • May 01, 2025: [Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Attorney Fees]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to Non-party]
  • July 28, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • May 09, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 05, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 05, 2022: [Remand]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 26, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • April 21, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 24, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.