U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00244
  • Case Name: Allen v. Clean Uniform Co
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 24, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.