U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00240
  • Case Name: Franks et al v. Apex Surgical LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order to Show Cause]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • August 10, 2022: [Docket]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Reply]
  • July 14, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 07, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • July 07, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Reply]
  • May 18, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 04, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • May 04, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • May 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • March 24, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 24, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 24, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.