U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00243
  • Case Name: McMahan v. Total Trucking Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 09, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 03, 2023: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 02, 2023: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Stay Case]
  • December 12, 2022: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • December 05, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 28, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 28, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • November 22, 2022: [Leave]
  • November 21, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 07, 2022: [Strike]
  • November 07, 2022: [Docket]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order]
  • October 10, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order]
  • September 26, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 15, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 15, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • June 22, 2022: [Stay Case]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 02, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 23, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • April 21, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • April 15, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • April 03, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • April 01, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • March 27, 2022: [Leave]
  • March 24, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Related or Companion Case]
  • March 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 24, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 24, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.