U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00241
  • Case Name: Martinez v. Siratanakhoune
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • December 15, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Summons Issued]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 20, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 06, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Add Party]
  • June 03, 2022: [Add Party]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 19, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • May 04, 2022: [Docket]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 25, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • March 24, 2022: [Certificate]
  • March 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.