U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00247
  • Case Name: Pharmacy Providers of Oklahoma Inc v. Medi Brothers LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Lift Stay]
  • September 08, 2022: [Lift Stay]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order Staying Case]
  • June 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 13, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • June 09, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • June 08, 2022: [Transfer Case]
  • June 08, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order]
  • June 02, 2022: [Suggestion of Bankruptcy]
  • June 02, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • June 02, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 24, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • May 19, 2022: [Default Judgment]
  • May 19, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 24, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 24, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.