U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00246
  • Case Name: Lugrand v. Walmart Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • November 11, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 02, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Docket]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • March 29, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • March 24, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 24, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • March 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.