U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00253
  • Case Name: Smith v. El Reno City of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [Status Conference]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • October 04, 2022: [Docket]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 12, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 22, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 08, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • May 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 12, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • May 06, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • April 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • April 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 12, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 28, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 28, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 28, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.