U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00252
  • Case Name: Abdulhaseeb v. Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 04, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 06, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • July 11, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • July 11, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Letter]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Receipt]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • March 28, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • March 28, 2022: [Brief]
  • March 28, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.