U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00257
  • Case Name: Dotson v. Midland Credit Management Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Reply]
  • April 22, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 19, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • April 19, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • April 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 05, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Receipt]
  • March 28, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 28, 2022: [Complaint]
  • March 28, 2022: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.