U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00255
  • Case Name: Dotson v. Credit Collection Services
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Surreply]
  • May 17, 2022: [Reply]
  • May 16, 2022: [Response to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 20, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 20, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • April 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 20, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order]
  • April 15, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • April 05, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 28, 2022: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • March 28, 2022: [Receipt]
  • March 28, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.