U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00256
  • Case Name: Dotson v. Credit Bureau Service Association
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • April 29, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • April 25, 2022: [Leave]
  • April 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 05, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 28, 2022: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • March 28, 2022: [Receipt]
  • March 28, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.