U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00258
  • Case Name: Accelerated LLC v. LMI II LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 23, 2023: [Reply]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Notice (other)]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 10, 2023: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 06, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 01, 2022: [ADR Report by Mediator / Evaluator]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Return of Service - NON SUMMONS]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • September 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • September 27, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 03, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Leave]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • May 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order]
  • April 27, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 27, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 25, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • April 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2022: [Docket]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 04, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • April 01, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • April 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • March 29, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.