U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00259
  • Case Name: Meneely v. Harrah White Meadows Nursing LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 16, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 08, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Docket]
  • July 13, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • July 13, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • July 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order]
  • July 08, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 31, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 29, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 29, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.