U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00262
  • Case Name: Mercado v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • January 03, 2023: [Attorney Fees]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 23, 2022: [Brief]
  • December 23, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • September 26, 2022: [Remand to Agency]
  • September 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • June 27, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order]
  • June 23, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • June 23, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 29, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 29, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.