U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00260
  • Case Name: Martinez v. Genworth Life Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 02, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 19, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2022: [Dismiss]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Declaration]
  • March 31, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 29, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • March 29, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 29, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.