U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00264
  • Case Name: Dotson v. AD Astra Recovery Services Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 14, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 10, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • June 10, 2022: [USCA Appeal Fee]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • June 09, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 09, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • June 07, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 02, 2022: [Response to Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • May 10, 2022: [Dismiss]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 26, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 25, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 18, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 05, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 30, 2022: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • March 30, 2022: [Receipt]
  • March 30, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.