U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00261
  • Case Name: Maston v. Grady County
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Exhibit List]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • January 13, 2023: [Witness List]
  • January 10, 2023: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • November 01, 2022: [Witness List]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • October 19, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 31, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • May 10, 2022: [Docket]
  • May 03, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • May 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 30, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 30, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.