U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00263
  • Case Name: Jet Maintenance Inc v. Devon Energy Production Company LP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 02, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • December 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • September 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 07, 2022: [Docket]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 09, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 09, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Strike]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • June 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 23, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • June 23, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order]
  • June 21, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • June 14, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • June 09, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • June 09, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Reply]
  • May 20, 2022: [Response to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • April 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 05, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 05, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • April 05, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.