U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00266
  • Case Name: Stoker v. American Medical Response of Oklahoma Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • October 26, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 25, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • May 25, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • May 10, 2022: [Docket]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • April 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • March 30, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 30, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.