U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00265
  • Case Name: Dillsaver v. Williams et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Reply]
  • September 16, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 14, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 09, 2022: [Stay Case]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Reply]
  • May 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 02, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • April 22, 2022: [Expedite]
  • April 22, 2022: [Stay Case]
  • April 20, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • April 11, 2022: [Remand]
  • April 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 05, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • April 05, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
  • April 01, 2022: [Extension of Time]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 30, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 30, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.