U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00268
  • Case Name: South v. Crow
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 19, 2022: [Extension of Time]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Receipt]
  • April 05, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 31, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • March 31, 2022: [Hearing]
  • March 31, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • March 31, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.