U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00269
  • Case Name: Brown v. Archer Western Construction LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order to Show Cause]
  • January 04, 2023: [Reply]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • December 13, 2022: [Stay Case]
  • December 09, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 01, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • December 01, 2022: [Witness List]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • April 25, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • April 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 13, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • April 12, 2022: [Docket]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 31, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.