U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00270
  • Case Name: Zhou v. Romberg et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Objections]
  • January 17, 2023: [Witness List]
  • January 03, 2023: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • December 01, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • November 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 29, 2022: [ADR Report by Mediator / Evaluator]
  • November 09, 2022: [Status Report]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 08, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Docket]
  • May 16, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • May 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Receipt]
  • March 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 31, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 31, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.