U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00267
  • Case Name: Hancock v. Grady County Jail et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • June 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • June 01, 2022: [Mail Returned]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Order]
  • April 11, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 31, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • March 31, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 31, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.