U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00272
  • Case Name: Nolen v. Farris
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • January 23, 2023: [File Excess Pages]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Transcript]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order]
  • May 24, 2022: [Other Hearing]
  • May 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order]
  • April 05, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 31, 2022: [Receipt]
  • March 31, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 31, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.